+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On January 13, 2020 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On February 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- LAWS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 18, 2019 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards. (View Original Bill)