+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On January 21, 2020 in the House:
- House Rules "X" file.
On January 13, 2020 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Consideration.
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- CRJ - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 18, 2019 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary. (View Original Bill)