+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (47)
On May 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Effective date 7/28/2019.
- Chapter 336, 2019 Laws PV. (View Session Law)
- Governor partially vetoed. (View Veto Message)
On April 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor. (View Bill as Passed Legislature)
On April 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Passed final passage; yeas, 94; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 4. (View Roll Calls)
- House concurred in Senate amendments.
On April 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate receded from amendments.
- Returned to second reading for amendment.
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 40; nays, 9; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View Roll Calls)
On April 19, 2019 in the House:
- House refuses to concur in Senate amendments. Asks Senate to recede from amendments.
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Committee amendment(s) adopted with no other amendments.
On April 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- WM - Majority; do pass with amendment(s). (Majority Report)
- Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions, Economic Development & Trade at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- FIET - Majority; do pass with amendment(s). (Majority Report)
- On motion, referred to Ways & Means.
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions, Economic Development & Trade at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On March 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Financial Institutions, Economic Development & Trade.
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. (View 1st Engrossed) (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
- 3rd substitute bill substituted (APP 19). (View 3rd Substitute)
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On March 1, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
- APP - Majority; 3rd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 3rd Substitute) (Majority Report)
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations.
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- FIN - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 2nd Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Finance.
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- RDAN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 18, 2019 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources. (View Original Bill)
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor