+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On January 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On June 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- On motion, referred to Transportation.
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- And refer to Ways & Means.
- LAW - Majority; do pass with amendment(s).
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM.
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 1:30 PM.
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Law & Justice.
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- 2nd substitute bill substituted (GGIT 15).
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 13, 2015 in the House:
- GGIT - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on General Government & Information Technology at 8:00 AM.
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on General Government & Information Technology at 3:30 PM.
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to General Government & Information Technology.
On January 30, 2015 in the House:
- PS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
- PS - Executive action taken by committee.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 11:00 AM.
On January 27, 2015 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM.
On January 19, 2015 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Public Safety (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
+ − Amendments (3)
1320-S2 AMH SENN HARA 005
ADOPTED 03/10/2015
1320-S2 AMH MACE HARA 008
ADOPTED 03/10/2015
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor