+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Effective date 7/28/2013.
- Chapter 5, 2013 Laws.
- Governor signed.
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor.
- President signed.
- Speaker signed.
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On March 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Governmental Operations at 10:00 AM.
- GOV - Majority; do pass.
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Governmental Operations at 10:00 AM.
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Governmental Operations.
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- GOE - Majority; do pass.
- GOE - Executive action taken by committee.
- Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Government Operations & Elections at 1:30 PM.
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Government Operations & Elections.
+ − Sponsors (34)
Type:
Primary Sponsor