+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On May 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Effective date 7/28/2019.
- Chapter 240, 2019 Laws. (View Session Law)
- Governor signed.
On April 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor. (View Bill as Passed Legislature)
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On April 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
- WM - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
On March 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Ways & Means.
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 2. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- CB - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 9:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 9:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 9:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 18, 2019 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Capital Budget. (View Original Bill)