+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On January 13, 2020 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On March 1, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- APP - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Consumer Protection & Business. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations.
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- CPB - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 23, 2019 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 18, 2019 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Consumer Protection & Business. (View Original Bill)