+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On January 11, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Transportation.
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration.
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On June 28, 2015 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 29, 2015 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 17, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Minority; do not pass.
- TR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 6:00 PM.
On April 7, 2015 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 10:00 AM.
On January 16, 2015 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Transportation (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor