+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
- By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Commerce & Labor.
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 92; nays, 6; absent, 0; excused, 0.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- 1st substitute bill substituted (GGIT 16).
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on General Government & Information Technology at 8:00 AM.
- GGIT - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
On January 11, 2016 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On June 28, 2015 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 29, 2015 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to General Government & Information Technology.
On February 16, 2015 in the House:
- COG - Majority; do pass.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 1:30 PM.
On January 20, 2015 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 1:30 PM.
On January 16, 2015 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Commerce & Gaming (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).