+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Effective date 7/25/2021.
- Chapter 123, 2021 Laws. (View Session Law)
- Governor signed.
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor. (View Bill as Passed Legislature)
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Passed final passage; yeas, 91; nays, 7; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View Roll Calls)
- House concurred in Senate amendments.
On April 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 3. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Committee amendment(s) adopted with no other amendments.
On March 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading consent calendar.
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- LCTA - Majority; do pass with amendment(s). (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs at 10:30 AM. (Committee Materials)
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs at 9:30 AM. (Committee Materials)
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs.
On March 8, 2021 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 91; nays, 6; absent, 0; excused, 1. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On January 29, 2021 in the House:
- COG - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 26, 2021 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 9:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 19, 2021 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Commerce & Gaming. (View Original Bill)
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor