+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (39)
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
On February 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Transportation.
On February 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 62; nays, 36; absent, 0; excused, 0.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On February 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On January 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- TR - Executive action taken by committee.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
- TR - Majority; do pass.
- Minority; do not pass.
On January 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
On January 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Transportation.
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- CDHT - Majority; do pass.
- CDHT - Executive action taken by committee.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Community Development and Housing & Tribal Affairs at 8:00 AM.
On January 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Community Development and Housing & Tribal Affairs at 8:00 AM.
On January 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs.
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration.
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On November 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Transportation.
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 67; nays, 29; absent, 0; excused, 2.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
- TR - Executive action taken by committee.
- TR - Majority; do pass.
- Minority; do not pass.
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Transportation.
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Minority; do not pass.
- CDHT - Majority; do pass.
- CDHT - Executive action taken by committee.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Community Development and Housing & Tribal Affairs at 10:00 AM.
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Community Development and Housing & Tribal Affairs at 8:00 AM.
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs.
+ − Amendments (5)
1286 AMH SHEA H4154.1
NOT ADOPTED 02/13/2014
1286 AMH DAHL RUSS 033
FAILED 02/13/2014
1286 AMH ORCU RUSS 014
NOT ADOPTED 02/13/2014
1286 AMH ORCU RUSS 055
FAILED 03/05/2013
1286 AMH SHEA RUSS 057
FAILED 03/05/2013
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor