+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Effective date 7/23/2017.
- Chapter 83, 2017 Laws. (View Session Law)
- Governor signed.
On April 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor. (View Bill as Passed Legislature)
On April 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
- LAW - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Law & Justice.
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- JUDI - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 19, 2017 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 16, 2017 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Judiciary (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report). (View Original Bill)
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor