+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (33)
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Effective date 7/28/2013.
- Chapter 173, 2013 Laws.
- Governor signed.
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor.
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Speaker signed.
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed final passage; yeas, 95; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3.
- House concurred in Senate amendments.
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments.
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1.
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
- WM - Majority; do pass with amendment(s) by Human Services & Corrections.
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:45 PM.
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- HSC - Majority; do pass with amendment(s).
- Referred to Ways & Means.
- And refer to Ways & Means.
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 10:00 AM.
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 10:00 AM.
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Human Services & Corrections.
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- 1st substitute bill substituted (ELHS 13).
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- Made eligible to be placed on second reading.
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 15, 2013 in the House:
- ELHS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
- ELHS - Executive action taken by committee.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 1:30 PM.
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 1:30 PM.
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Early Learning & Human Services.
+ − Amendment
1284-S AMS HSC S2388.1
ADOPTED 04/17/2013
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor