+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 8, 2018 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On June 21, 2017 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 24, 2017 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 16, 2017 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Appropriations (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report). (View Original Bill)
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor