+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (30)
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Higher Education & Workforce Development.
On February 12, 2020 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 61; nays, 34; absent, 0; excused, 3. (View Roll Calls)
On February 10, 2020 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on third reading.
On January 13, 2020 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public hearing and executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways & Means.
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- And refer to Ways & Means.
- HEWD - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On March 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Higher Education & Workforce Development.
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 59; nays, 37; absent, 0; excused, 2. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On March 1, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- APP - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations.
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- CWD - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 8:30 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 17, 2019 in the House:
- First reading, referred to College & Workforce Development. (View Original Bill)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor