+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On January 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Education.
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration.
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On November 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
On March 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM.
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education.
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 89; nays, 8; absent, 0; excused, 1.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Committee amendment adopted and floor amendment(s) also adopted.
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Minority; do not pass.
- APPE - Majority; do pass with amendment(s).
- APPE - Executive action taken by committee.
- Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Appropriations Subcommittee on Education at 1:30 PM.
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations Subcommittee on Education.
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Minority; do not pass.
- ED - Majority; do pass with amendment(s).
- ED - Executive action taken by committee.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM.
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM.
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Education.
+ − Amendments (15)
1276 AMH REYK WICK 079
ADOPTED 03/08/2013
1276 AMH ED WICK 017
ADOPTED 03/08/2013
1276 AMH ED WICK 021
ADOPTED 03/08/2013
1276 AMH DAHL WICK 067
WITHDRAWN 03/08/2013
1276 AMH DAHL WICK 066
WITHDRAWN 03/08/2013
1276 AMH DAHL WICK 072
NOT CONSIDERED 03/08/2013
1276 AMH DAHL WICK 063
WITHDRAWN 03/08/2013
1276 AMH DAHL WICK 065
WITHDRAWN 03/08/2013
1276 AMH DAHL WICK 064
WITHDRAWN 03/08/2013
1276 AMH DAHL WICK 061
WITHDRAWN 03/08/2013
1276 AMH DAHL WICK 062
WITHDRAWN 03/08/2013
1276 AMH DAHL WICK 060
WITHDRAWN 03/08/2013
1276 AMH DAHL WICK 059
WITHDRAWN 03/08/2013
1276 AMH DAHL WICK 058
WITHDRAWN 03/08/2013
1276 AMH DAHL WICK 057
WITHDRAWN 03/08/2013
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor