+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 19, 2021 in the House:
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- CB - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 2nd Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Capital Budget.
On February 5, 2021 in the House:
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- CED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Community & Economic Development at 8:30 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Community & Economic Development at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 18, 2021 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Community & Economic Development. (View Original Bill)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor