+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On January 10, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Public Safety.
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration.
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 15, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 12, 2021 in the House:
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- PS - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 5, 2021 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 18, 2021 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Public Safety. (View Original Bill)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor