+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 13, 2020 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations.
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- PS - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 21, 2019 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 17, 2019 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Public Safety. (View Original Bill)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor