+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (32)
On January 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Education.
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration.
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On November 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
On March 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways & Means.
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- And refer to Ways & Means.
- EDU - Majority; do pass with amendment(s).
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM.
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM.
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education.
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 92; nays, 5; absent, 0; excused, 1.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
- 1st substitute bill substituted (APP 13).
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
- Minority; do not pass.
- APP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
- APP - Executive action taken by committee.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM.
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations.
On February 15, 2013 in the House:
- Minority; do not pass.
- ED - Majority; do pass.
- ED - Executive action taken by committee.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM.
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM.
On February 8, 2013 in the House:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM.
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM.
On January 21, 2013 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Education.
+ − Amendments (4)
1252-S AMH DAHL MCLA 825
WITHDRAWN 03/08/2013
1252-S AMH HAWK MCLA 830
ADOPTED 03/08/2013
1252-S AMH DAHL MCLA 824
WITHDRAWN 03/08/2013
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor