+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On January 13, 2014 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On November 7, 2013 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On February 1, 2013 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 1:30 PM.
On January 21, 2013 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Early Learning & Human Services.
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor