+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On January 13, 2020 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations.
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- HSEL - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 25, 2019 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 17, 2019 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Human Services & Early Learning. (View Original Bill)