+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On January 13, 2020 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Consideration.
On March 9, 2019 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- PS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 21, 2019 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 17, 2019 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Public Safety. (View Original Bill)