+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On January 8, 2018 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On June 21, 2017 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 24, 2017 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations.
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- LAWS - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 13, 2017 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report). (View Original Bill)