+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (51)
On May 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Effective date 7/25/2021*.
- Governor signed.
- Chapter 329, 2021 Laws. (View Session Law)
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor. (View Bill as Passed Legislature)
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Passed final passage; yeas, 56; nays, 41; absent, 0; excused, 1. (View Roll Calls)
- House concurred in Senate amendments.
On April 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Committee amendment(s) adopted as amended.
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 27; nays, 21; absent, 0; excused, 1. (View Roll Calls)
- Vote on third reading will be reconsidered.
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 28; nays, 20; absent, 0; excused, 1. (View Roll Calls)
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On April 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- WM - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
- Referred to Ways & Means.
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- And refer to Ways & Means.
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- TRAN - Majority; do pass with amendment(s) by Law & Justice. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On March 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Transportation.
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- And refer to Transportation.
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- LAW - Majority; do pass with amendment(s). (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:30 AM. (Committee Materials)
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 9:30 AM. (Committee Materials)
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Law & Justice.
On March 8, 2021 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 54; nays, 43; absent, 0; excused, 1. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- 1st substitute bill substituted (TR 21). (View 1st Substitute)
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- TR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 2:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 15, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Transportation.
On February 12, 2021 in the House:
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- PS - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 5, 2021 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 15, 2021 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Public Safety. (View Original Bill)
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor