+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (37)
On May 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Effective date 7/28/2019.
- Chapter 333, 2019 Laws. (View Session Law)
- Governor signed.
On April 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor. (View Bill as Passed Legislature)
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Passed final passage; yeas, 81; nays, 15; absent, 0; excused, 2. (View Roll Calls)
- House concurred in Senate amendments.
On April 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- WM - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways & Means.
On March 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
- And refer to Ways & Means.
- EDU - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On March 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education.
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 83; nays, 14; absent, 0; excused, 1. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- 2nd substitute bill substituted (APP 19). (View 2nd Substitute)
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On March 1, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 2nd Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations.
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- ED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 17, 2019 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Education. (View Original Bill)
+ − Sponsors (31)
Type:
Primary Sponsor