+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Effective date 7/28/2013.
- Chapter 168, 2013 Laws.
- Governor signed.
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor.
- President signed.
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Speaker signed.
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed final passage; yeas, 89; nays, 5; absent, 0; excused, 4.
- House concurred in Senate amendments.
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments.
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- HLTH - Majority; do pass with amendment(s).
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 10:00 AM.
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 10:00 AM.
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Health Care.
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 90; nays, 6; absent, 0; excused, 2.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- 1st substitute bill substituted (HCW 13).
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 8, 2013 in the House:
- HCW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
- HCW - Executive action taken by committee.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM.
On February 1, 2013 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM.
On January 21, 2013 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness.
+ − Amendment
1216-S AMS HLTH S2291.1
ADOPTED 04/12/2013
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor