+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On January 13, 2014 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On November 7, 2013 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM.
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations.
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- GOE - Majority; do pass.
- GOE - Executive action taken by committee.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Government Operations & Elections at 8:00 AM.
On January 29, 2013 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Government Operations & Elections at 8:00 AM.
On January 21, 2013 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Government Operations & Elections.
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor