+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Effective date 7/28/2019.
- Chapter 72, 2019 Laws. (View Session Law)
- Governor signed.
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor. (View Bill as Passed Legislature)
- President signed.
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading consent calendar.
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
- EDU - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education.
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- 1st substitute bill substituted (ED 19). (View 1st Substitute)
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- ED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 16, 2019 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Education. (View Original Bill)
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor