+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 13, 2020 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations.
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- SGOV - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 16, 2019 in the House:
- First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Relations. (View Original Bill)
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor