+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Effective date 7/25/2021.
- Chapter 66, 2021 Laws. (View Session Law)
- Governor signed.
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor. (View Bill as Passed Legislature)
On April 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On April 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading consent calendar.
On March 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- LAW - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:30 AM. (Committee Materials)
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 9:30 AM. (Committee Materials)
On March 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Law & Justice.
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- 1st substitute bill substituted (CRJ 21). (View 1st Substitute)
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 5, 2021 in the House:
- CRJ - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 29, 2021 in the House:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 26, 2021 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 15, 2021 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary. (View Original Bill)
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor