+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On January 13, 2020 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations.
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- ITED - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Innovation, Technology & Economic Development at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Innovation, Technology & Economic Development at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Innovation, Technology & Economic Development at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 23, 2019 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Innovation, Technology & Economic Development at 9:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 16, 2019 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Innovation, Technology & Economic Development. (View Original Bill)
+ − Sponsors (7)
Type:
Primary Sponsor