+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On January 13, 2020 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Public hearing and executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations.
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- RDAN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 23, 2019 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 16, 2019 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources. (View Original Bill)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor