+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (30)
On March 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
On March 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- WM - Majority; do pass with amendment(s). (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways & Means.
- And refer to Ways & Means.
- HLG - Majority; do pass with amendment(s). (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government at 10:30 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Housing & Local Government.
On January 28, 2022 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. (View Roll Calls)
On January 25, 2022 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On January 10, 2022 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
- APP - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 19, 2021 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 15, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations.
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- HHSV - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Housing, Human Services & Veterans at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 29, 2021 in the House:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Housing, Human Services & Veterans at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 21, 2021 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Housing, Human Services & Veterans at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Housing, Human Services & Veterans. (View Original Bill)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor