+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 3 Consideration.
On January 16, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on third reading by Rules Committee.
On January 8, 2018 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On June 21, 2017 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 24, 2017 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Commerce, Labor & Sports at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Commerce, Labor & Sports.
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 91; nays, 6; absent, 0; excused, 1. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- LAWS - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 24, 2017 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 13, 2017 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report). (View Original Bill)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor