+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (57)
On March 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- Effective date 6/9/2022.
- Governor signed.
- Chapter 259, 2022 Laws. (View Session Law)
On March 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor. (View Bill as Passed Legislature)
- President signed.
On March 8, 2022 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On March 7, 2022 in the House:
- Passed final passage; yeas, 85; nays, 13; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View Roll Calls)
- House concurred in Senate amendments.
On March 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 2. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Committee amendment(s) adopted with no other amendments.
On March 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- WM - Majority; do pass with amendment(s). (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
On February 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- On motion, referred to Ways & Means.
On February 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- BFST - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services & Trade at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services & Trade at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Business, Financial Services & Trade.
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 81; nays, 15; absent, 0; excused, 2. (View Roll Calls)
On February 7, 2022 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on third reading.
On January 10, 2022 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
On April 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading.
On April 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- WM - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On March 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways & Means.
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- And refer to Ways & Means.
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- BFST - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services & Trade at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services & Trade at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On March 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Business, Financial Services & Trade.
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 77; nays, 21; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- 2nd substitute bill substituted (CB 21). (View 2nd Substitute)
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- CB - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 2nd Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Capital Budget.
On January 29, 2021 in the House:
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- CED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Community & Economic Development at 8:30 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 26, 2021 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Community & Economic Development at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Community & Economic Development. (View Original Bill)