+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (55)
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Effective date 6/7/2018.
- Chapter 199, 2018 Laws. (View Session Law)
- Governor signed.
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor. (View Bill as Passed Legislature)
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On March 3, 2018 in the House:
- Passed final passage; yeas, 80; nays, 16; absent, 0; excused, 2. (View Roll Calls)
- House concurred in Senate amendments.
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Committee amendment(s) adopted with no other amendments.
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
- HEWD - Majority; do pass with amendment(s). (Majority Report)
On February 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Higher Education & Workforce Development.
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 79; nays, 15; absent, 0; excused, 4. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- 3rd substitute bill substituted (APP 18). (View 3rd Substitute)
On January 26, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On January 25, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- APP - Majority; 3rd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 3rd Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 18, 2018 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 8, 2018 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
- Referred to Appropriations.
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration.
On June 21, 2017 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 24, 2017 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways & Means.
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- And refer to Ways & Means.
- HIE - Majority; do pass with amendment(s). (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Higher Education at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Higher Education at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Higher Education.
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- 2nd substitute bill substituted (APP 17). (View 2nd Substitute)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 76; nays, 22; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View Roll Calls)
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 2nd Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations.
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- HE - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Higher Education at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Higher Education at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 12, 2017 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Higher Education (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report). (View Original Bill)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor