+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On April 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On April 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Ways & Means.
On March 28, 2021 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 93; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 1. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- 2nd substitute bill substituted (FIN 21). (View 2nd Substitute)
On March 26, 2021 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- FIN - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 2nd Substitute) (Majority Report)
On February 19, 2021 in the House:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Finance at 9:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 9:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 15, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Finance.
On February 12, 2021 in the House:
- LG - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 12, 2021 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Local Government. (View Original Bill)
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor