+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (35)
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- LAW - Majority; do pass with amendment(s). (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Law & Justice.
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Vote on third reading will be reconsidered.
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 87; nays, 11; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Returned to second reading for amendment.
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 90; nays, 8; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View 1st Engrossed) (View Roll Calls)
On January 19, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on third reading by Rules Committee.
On January 8, 2018 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On June 21, 2017 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 24, 2017 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Law & Justice.
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 90; nays, 8; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- 1st substitute bill substituted (PS 17). (View 1st Substitute)
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
- APP - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Public Safety. (Majority Report)
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 24, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations.
On January 19, 2017 in the House:
- PS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 12, 2017 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Public Safety (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report). (View Original Bill)
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor