+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (53)
On May 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Effective date 1/1/2020.
- Governor signed.
- Chapter 296, 2019 Laws. (View Session Law)
On April 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor. (View Bill as Passed Legislature)
On April 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Passed final passage as recommended by conference committee; yeas, 70; nays, 24; absent, 0; excused, 4. (View Roll Calls)
- Conference committee report adopted.
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed final passage as recommended by conference committee; yeas, 32; nays, 16; absent, 0; excused, 1. (View Roll Calls)
- Conference committee report adopted.
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference committee appointed. Senators Dhingra, King, Van De Wege.
- Conference committee request granted.
- Conference committee report; received 6:00 PM 4/23/2019.
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Conference committee report; received 6:05 PM 4/23/2019.
On April 22, 2019 in the House:
- Conference committee appointed. Representatives Cody, Mosbrucker, Sells.
- House refuses to concur in the Senate amendments. Asks Senate for Conference thereon.
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 30; nays, 18; absent, 0; excused, 1. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
- Committee amendment not adopted.
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On April 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- WM - Majority; do pass with amendment(s) by Labor & Commerce. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways & Means.
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- And refer to Ways & Means.
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- LBRC - Majority; do pass with amendment(s). (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:30 AM. (Committee Materials)
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:30 AM. (Committee Materials)
On March 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce.
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 63; nays, 34; absent, 0; excused, 1. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- 1st substitute bill substituted (APP 19). (View 1st Substitute)
- Held on second reading.
On March 1, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
- APP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations.
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- LAWS - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 21, 2019 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 16, 2019 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards. (View Original Bill)
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor