+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On January 11, 2016 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On June 28, 2015 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 29, 2015 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations.
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Minority; do not pass.
- HCW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM.
On February 13, 2015 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 10:00 AM.
On January 14, 2015 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor