+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Effective date 7/28/2013.
- Chapter 98, 2013 Laws.
- Governor signed.
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor.
On April 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Speaker signed.
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 43; nays, 5; absent, 0; excused, 1.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
- CL - Majority; do pass.
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Commerce & Labor at 1:30 PM.
On March 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Commerce & Labor at 8:00 AM.
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Commerce & Labor.
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Consideration.
On January 25, 2013 in the House:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- OVER - Majority; do pass.
- OVER - Executive action taken by committee.
- Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Government Accountability & Oversight at 1:30 PM.
On January 17, 2013 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Government Accountability & Oversight.