+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Effective date 7/24/2015.
- Chapter 74, 2015 Laws.
- Governor signed.
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor.
On April 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Speaker signed.
On April 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- GOS - Majority; do pass.
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Security at 10:00 AM.
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Security at 10:00 AM.
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Government Operations & Security.
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- 1st substitute bill substituted (LG 15).
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On January 30, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- LG - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
- LG - Executive action taken by committee.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM.
On January 21, 2015 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM.
On January 14, 2015 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Local Government (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor