+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On January 10, 2022 in the House:
- House Rules "X" file.
On March 26, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On March 25, 2021 in the House:
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- TR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 21, 2021 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 11, 2021 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Transportation. (View Original Bill)
On January 8, 2021 in the House:
- Prefiled for introduction.