+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (27)
On January 8, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Higher Education.
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration.
On June 21, 2017 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 24, 2017 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- LAW - Majority; do pass with amendment(s). (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Law & Justice.
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- 1st substitute bill substituted (HE 17). (View 1st Substitute)
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 77; nays, 21; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- APP - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Higher Education. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations.
On January 24, 2017 in the House:
- HE - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Higher Education at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Higher Education at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 12, 2017 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Higher Education (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report). (View Original Bill)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor