+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On January 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration.
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
- Referred to Education.
On June 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM.
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education.
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- 1st substitute bill substituted (ED 15).
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 92; nays, 5; absent, 0; excused, 1.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- ED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
- ED - Executive action taken by committee.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM.
On January 22, 2015 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM.
On January 13, 2015 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Education (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor