+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (36)
On May 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Effective date 7/25/2021.
- Chapter 152, 2021 Laws. (View Session Law)
- Governor signed.
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor. (View Bill as Passed Legislature)
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Passed final passage; yeas, 97; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View Roll Calls)
- House concurred in Senate amendments.
On April 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee amendment(s) adopted with no other amendments.
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 1; excused, 0. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On April 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On April 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- WM - Majority; do pass with amendment(s) by Higher Education & Workforce Development. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On March 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways & Means.
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
- And refer to Ways & Means.
- HEWD - Majority; do pass with amendment(s). (Majority Report)
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Higher Education & Workforce Development.
On February 12, 2021 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- APP - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 22, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations.
On January 21, 2021 in the House:
- CWD - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 18, 2021 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 11, 2021 in the House:
- First reading, referred to College & Workforce Development. (View Original Bill)
On January 8, 2021 in the House:
- Prefiled for introduction.