+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Law & Justice.
On February 17, 2014 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 94; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 2.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On February 14, 2014 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
- Minority; do not pass.
- JUDI - Majority; do pass.
- JUDI - Executive action taken by committee.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 3:30 PM.
On January 31, 2014 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM.
On January 13, 2014 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On November 7, 2013 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 8:00 AM.
On January 16, 2013 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Judiciary.