+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On January 8, 2018 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On June 21, 2017 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 24, 2017 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On January 11, 2017 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Judiciary (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report). (View Original Bill)