+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 13, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Environment.
- Committee relieved of further consideration.
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On November 7, 2013 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM.
On January 16, 2013 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Local Government.
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor